Charbonneau, Sylvia Mary (CPSO#: 67029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
265 Yorkland Blvd.
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: (416) 229-2399 Ext. 274
Fax: (416) 222-9771
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA MARY CHARBONNEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARBONNEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1998