Charbonneau, Yoland Raynald (CPSO#: 58361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
D6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4588
Fax: (613) 761-4177
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoland Charbonneau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Charbonneau ( CPSO# 58361 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
D-6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4588

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOLAND RAYNALD CHARBONNEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARBONNEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 15 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)