Charendoff, Morris David (CPSO#: 12493)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1947
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1948
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1950
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 2013