Charette, Luc (CPSO#: 30594)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CHEO 401 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 25 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016