Chari, Ravi Samavedam (CPSO#: 69888)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2000