Charlat, Martin Lorne (CPSO#: 58885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Charlat, Martin L. (used until: 26 Aug 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
San Diego Cardiovascular Associates
9834 Genesee Ave
Suite 300
La Jolla CA  92037
United States
Phone: (858) 824-2900
Fax: (858) 824-2910

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 3, 2015, the following voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking
            by Dr. Martin Lorne Charlat is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on
            the certificate of registration held by Dr. Charlat:
                        
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. MARTIN LORNE CHARLAT
                                          ("Dr. Charlat")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   Dr. Charlat, certificate of registration number 58885, am a member of the
                  College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement
                  to participate in a program of continuing professional development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Charlat, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am
                  entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the
                  Continuing Professional Development requirement under section 29 of
                  Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Charlat, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not
                  practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following
                  conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Charlat, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance
                  Plan ("OHIP") that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered
                  after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees
                  that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. If I do not have an active OHIP billing number, I undertake
                  to provide proof of same to the College.

            (5)   I, Dr. Charlat, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge and agree that in considering my request to
                  return to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Charlat, undertake to comply with the provisions and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Charlat has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario
                        and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice
                        or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Charlat, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Charlat, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 3, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Martin Lorne Charlat to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 3, 2015:

Dr. Charlat has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.