Charles, David Austin (CPSO#: 29878)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1998