Charles, Laurence John (CPSO#: 42509)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007