Charles, Marie Muriel (CPSO#: 66731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Medical Centre
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 Terminal ave, Unit B22
Ottawa, On
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Canada
Phone: 613 731-4700
Fax: 613 731-6201
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE MURIEL CHARLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1995