Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Charles, Mark Nicholas (CPSO#: 69313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 722-3987
Fax: (613) 722-0902
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MN Charles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2008


Corporation Name: MN Charles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Champagne ( CPSO# 70027 )
Dr. M. Charles ( CPSO# 69313 )

Business Address:
106 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-3987

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK NICHOLAS CHARLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005