Charlton, Scott Thomas (CPSO#: 77633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charlton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Charlton ( CPSO# 77633 )

Business Address:
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT THOMAS CHARLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2008