Charriere, Norma Marie Evangeline (CPSO#: 88491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Picton Clinic
Suite 7, 389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-5744
Fax: (613) 476-8773
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norma Charriere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Charriere ( CPSO# 88491 )

Business Address:
Picton Clinic
7 - 389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-5744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMA MARIE EVANGELINE CHARRIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARRIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010