Charron, Martin (CPSO#: 67470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BSA Diagnostics Medical Imaging -
Kennedy Sheppard Diagnostic Clinic
4002 Sheppard Ave E, Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M8X1A7
Phone: 416-299-9895
Fax: (416)299-9221
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Virgini commonwelth universit
Marshal street
richmond VA  23229
United States
Phone: 804-363-8135
County: 
Electoral District: 

Toronto West Cardiac and
Medical Imaging Centre Ltd.
4250 Weston Road #100
North York, ON M9L 1W9
North York ON  M9L 1W9
Canada
Phone: (416)740-3184
Fax: (416)740-3189
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN CHARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARRON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004