Chartrand, Serge (CPSO#: 85514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Univ of Ottawa Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Serge Chartrand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2011


Corporation Name: Societe Professionnelle de Medecine du Docteur S. Chartrand

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chartrand ( CPSO# 85514 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGE CHARTRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARTRAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017