Chattergoon, Dhurbassa Sieusankar (CPSO#: 61556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 745-8742
Fax: (416) 745-7507
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHURBASSA SIEUSANKAR CHATTERGOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERGOON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1996