Chattha, Ishvinder Singh (CPSO#: 95241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone: (519) 925-0017
Fax: 519 925 6717
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

151 Centre St
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R7
Canada
Phone: (519) 925-2140
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

355 Broadway
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y3
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-3351
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

200 Robert St
Shelburne ON  L0N 1S1
Canada
Phone: (519) 925-3746
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I.S. Chattha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chattha ( CPSO# 95241 )

Business Address:
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone Number: (519) 925-0017

Business Address:
151 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R7
Phone Number: (519) 925-2140

Business Address:
355 Broadway Avenue
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y3
Phone Number: (519) 941-3351

Business Address:
200 Robert Street
Shelburne ON  L0N 1S1
Phone Number: (519) 925-3746

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISHVINDER SINGH CHATTHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013