Chaturvedi, Prabhat Kumar (CPSO#: 27320)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1996