Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chau, Laurence Kwok-Leong (CPSO#: 62968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Southampton, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 420
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-3366
Fax: (905) 842-1180
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurence Chau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chau ( CPSO# 62968 )

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 420
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 842-3366

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENCE KWOK-LEONG CHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1992