Chau, Vicky (CPSO#: 93000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 421
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 598-4800
Fax: (416) 598-8327
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Geriatric Medicine Clinic
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: (416) 597-7074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vicky Chau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chau ( CPSO# 93000 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Geriatric Medicine
Room 5-113
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Suite 421
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 598-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICKY CHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 06 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2010 to 20 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012