Chaudhary, Ammar Gulzar Ahmad G (CPSO#: 84196)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 May 2006 to 10 Jul 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Jul 2007 to 19 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2009