Chaudhary, Ripan (CPSO#: 74669)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 May 2000 to 23 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2005