Chaudhary, Simone (CPSO#: 107172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Radiation Oncology
3rd Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 64628
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMONE CHAUDHARY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAUDHARY is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHAUDHARY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAUDHARY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHAUDHARY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHAUDHARY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHAUDHARY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018