Chaudhary, Varun (CPSO#: 77582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Care
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-7777
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Chaudhary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chaudhary ( CPSO# 77582 )

Business Address:
St Joseph Health Care
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARUN CHAUDHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007