Chaudhri, Arif Rahman (CPSO#: 63818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2077A Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N 1X7
Phone: (416) 241-5281
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Arif Rahman Chaudhri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaudhri ( CPSO# 63818 )

Business Address:
2077A Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 241-5281

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF RAHMAN CHAUDHRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992