Chaudhry, Asad Rehman (CPSO#: 104582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asad Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 104582)

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASAD REHMAN CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2014