Chaudhry, Ayeshah (CPSO#: 93787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rawalpindi Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Genetics- Room 1A100
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayeshah Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 93787 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Room 1A100
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 31 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYESHAH CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2016