Chaudhry, Ijaz Ahmed (CPSO#: 66387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 3530
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ijaz Ahmed Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 66387 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
10 - 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
8 - 51 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Business Address:
Suite 110 - 111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Business Address:
2 - 4000 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 851-3777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IJAZ AHMED CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995