Chaudhry, Sajjad Ahmad (CPSO#: 59841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 48000
Fax: (416) 242-1069
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Faith AVe
North York ON  M3H 1W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 512-0490
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sajjad Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 59841 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAJJAD AHMAD CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1989