Chaudhry, Shehla Naz (CPSO#: 93983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Ottawa Specialty Care
Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SN Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 93983 )

Business Address:
210 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEHLA NAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016