Chaudhry, Uzma Siddiq (CPSO#: 80369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Health Centre
Unit 16
2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: (905) 828-0270
Fax: (905) 828-0277
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 80369 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Health Centre
Unit 16
2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone Number: (905) 828-0270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UZMA SIDDIQ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2003 to 09 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007