Chauhan, Vijay Singh (CPSO#: 65099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gerrard Wing, Rm 3-522
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3172
Fax: (416) 340-4710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. S. Chauhan & Dr. M. Madan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Madan ( CPSO# 66200 )
Dr. V. Chauhan ( CPSO# 65099 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
150 Gerrard Street West
RM 3-522
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D380 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIJAY SINGH CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993