Chavez Johnston, Noemi (CPSO#: 103226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: 519 9631875
Fax: 5199631880
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chavez Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chavez Johnston ( CPSO# 103226)

Business Address:
Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOEMI CHAVEZ JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAVEZ JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016