Chawla, Harmeet Kaur (CPSO#: 87446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
875 Main Street East
Unit 6
Milton ON  L9T 3Z3
Phone: (905) 875-0955
Fax: (905) 636-8620
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Strowger Blvd, Suite 116
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Canada
Phone: 613 342 2373
Fax: 613 345 6559
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

875 Main Street East
Unit 6
Milton, Ontario
Milton ON  L9T3Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-875-0955
Fax: 905-636-8620
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville, Ontario
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5649
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

2015 Kingsridge Drive
Unit 6
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 465-3739
Fax: 905 465-2367
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Rd
Milton, Ontario
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harmeet Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chawla ( CPSO# 87446 )

Business Address:
Suite 116
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone Number: (613) 342-2373

Business Address:
Unit 6
875 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 3Z3
Phone Number: (905) 875-0955

Business Address:
Unit 2
2015 Kingsridge Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 465-3739

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMEET KAUR CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011