Chawla, Punita Tanya (CPSO#: 75359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 567 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6584
Fax: (416) 586-8695
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNITA TANYA CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006