Chaytor, Julie Rosanna (CPSO#: 106034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
Integrated Health Building Site
Department of Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0024 Ext. 1
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ROSANNA CHAYTOR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAYTOR is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHAYTOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAYTOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHAYTOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHAYTOR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHAYTOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 01 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jun 2018