Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Che, Claudius Tak Kwai (CPSO#: 56739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
137 Catherine Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 2H9
Phone: (905) 871-5077
Fax: (905) 871-5079
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3658 Hibbard St
Ridgeway ON  L0S 1N0
Canada
Phone: (905) 894-1311
Fax: (905) 894-8813
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claudius Che Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Che ( CPSO# 56739 )

Business Address:
137 Catherine Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 2H9
Phone Number: (905) 871-5077

Business Address:
3658 Hibbard Street
Ridgeway ON  L0S 1N0
Phone Number: (905) 894-1311


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 54088 )
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )
Dr. N. Jayawardene ( CPSO# 72587 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. N. Hoosen ( CPSO# 80356 )
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )
Dr. C. Che ( CPSO# 56739 )
Dr. J. Colorado ( CPSO# 74233 )
Dr. B. Dalgleish ( CPSO# 50321 )
Dr. K. Scher ( CPSO# 85889 )

Business Address:
7 - 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIUS TAK KWAI CHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1987