Cheah, Henry Kah-Loon (CPSO#: 66585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Street Medical Arts Centre
71 King Street West
Suite 406
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 275-8688
Fax: (905) 275-1094
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Cheah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheah ( CPSO# 66585 )

Business Address:
King Street Medical Arts Centre
Suite 406
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 275-8688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY KAH-LOON CHEAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998