Cheema, Amarjit Singh (CPSO#: 57225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
470 Hensall Circle
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V4
Phone: (905) 566-0555
Fax: (905) 566-5294
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.S. Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2007


Corporation Name: A.S. Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheema ( CPSO# 57225 )

Business Address:
100 - 470 Hensall Circle
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 566-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMARJIT SINGH CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1986