Cheema, Parneet Kaur (CPSO#: 84365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494 6542
Fax: (905) 494 6417
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 rolling hills drive
Orangeville ON  L9W4X9
Canada
Phone: 5199412410
Fax: 5199437221
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 9054946542
Fax: 9054946217
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P K Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cheema ( CPSO# 84365 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARNEET KAUR CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010