Cheeseman, Frank David (CPSO#: 59183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department Of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. S. Grahovac ( CPSO# 54394 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301


Corporation Name: Frank Cheeseman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK DAVID CHEESEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEESEMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1988