Chehil, Rakesh Singh (CPSO#: 67253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
7130 120th Street
Surrey BC  V3W 3M8
Phone: (604) 572-4437
Fax: (604) 572-4438

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH SINGH CHEHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEHIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009