Cheifetz, Philip Nathan (CPSO#: 17944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 605
251 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1X3
Phone: (613) 569-5222
Fax: (888) 219-4779
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP NATHAN CHEIFETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEIFETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Mar 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1982