Cheifetz, Rona Esther (CPSO#: 53956)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1998