Chek, Vanroeung (CPSO#: 42639)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cambodian, English, French, Lao, Thai

Education:Phnon-Penh University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005