Chekina, Helena (CPSO#: 50249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:L'vov Medical Institute, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: (905) 597-4458
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Transwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M2R 2K1
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-5864
Fax: (416) 222-5680
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6464 Yonge Street,Suite 206
Toronto ON  M2M 3X4
Canada
Phone: 416-222-5864
Fax: 416-222-5680
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Chekina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chekina ( CPSO# 50249 )

Business Address:
206 - 6464 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 3X4
Phone Number: (416) 222-5864

Business Address:
101 Medical Centre
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 101
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9
Phone Number: (905) 597-4457

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA CHEKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEKINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1986