Chemello, Diego (CPSO#: 89475)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011