Chemparathy, Joseph Varghese (CPSO#: 87794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Calcutta, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Medical Associates
Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 315-9929
Fax: (905) 315-9314
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH VARGHESE CHEMPARATHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEMPARATHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009