Chen, Alice Illum (CPSO#: 55888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2830 Keele St., Suite 402
Toronto ON  M3M 3E5
Phone: (416) 633-7337
Fax: (416) 633-8099
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE ILLUM CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986