Chen, Anthony Chi-Fu (CPSO#: 93777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Church Wellesley Health Centre
491 Church Street, Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone: (416) 463-1500
Fax: (416) 463-6577
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Yorkville Vein Clinic
1240 Bay Street, Suite 404
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 927-0533
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony C.F. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chen ( CPSO# 93777 )

Business Address:
Church Wellesley Health Centre
200 - 491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 463-6929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHI-FU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012