Chen, Christine Ippal (CPSO#: 69376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 5-220
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2827
Fax: (416) 946-4563
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 15 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE IPPAL CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1996